Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Saverio de Souza Monteiro

Deceased

Bishop of Beja, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1829Born
18 Jul 185828.7Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jul 188353.6SelectedBishop of Beja, Portugal
9 Aug 188353.7ConfirmedBishop of Beja, Portugal
25 Nov 188354.0Ordained BishopBishop of Beja, Portugal
1 Jun 190676.5DiedBishop of Beja, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Antonio Saverio de Souza Monteiro
Bishop Antonio Saverio de Souza Monteiro (born , died ) Bishop of Beja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained BishopS. Jacques, Beja, Diocese of Beja

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 143
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017