Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Alves Martins, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Viseu, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1808Born
19 Mar 183123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
12 Sep 186254.5SelectedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
25 Sep 186254.6ConfirmedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
1 Nov 186254.7Ordained BishopBishop of Viseu, Portugal
5 Feb 188273.9DiedBishop of Viseu, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António Alves Martins (VIAF: 50773562)
Bishop António Alves Martins O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Viseu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrancha de Alijó, Archdiocese of Braga

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 593
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 Jan 2017