Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Inácio do Nascimento Cardinal Morais Cardoso

Deceased

Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1811Born
19 Dec 183523.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
6 Jul 186351.5SelectedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
28 Sep 186351.7ConfirmedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
14 Feb 186452.1Ordained BishopBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
18 Mar 187159.2SelectedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
25 Apr 187159.3ConfirmedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
22 Dec 187362.0Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 187765.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
23 Feb 188371.1DiedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Inácio do Nascimento Morais Cardoso (VIAF: 98897578)
Inácio do Nascimento Cardinal Morais Cardoso (born , died ) Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMurça, Archdiocese of Braga
Ordained PriestEpiscopal Palace, Chapel, Coimbra, Diocese of Coimbra
Ordained BishopSão Vicente de Fora, Church, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Death PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
  • a cardinal for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 346, and Page 450
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 51
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1864, Number 5
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1873

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017