Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo do Barco, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cabo Verde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1775BornBarco, Portugal
22 Dec 179823.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
21 Feb 182045.1AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
27 Dec 183156.9ResignedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
30 Jun 185277.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cabo Verde

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo do Barco
Bishop Jerónimo do Barco O.F.M. Ref. (born 1775, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santiago de Cabo Verde

  • a priest for 53.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 218
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016