Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo José da Costa Rebęlo

Deceased

Bishop of Porto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1783BornBraga
25 Feb 180925.3Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 184259.1SelectedBishop of Porto, Portugal
19 Jun 184359.6ConfirmedBishop of Porto, Portugal
20 Aug 184359.8Ordained BishopBishop of Porto, Portugal
27 Feb 185470.3DiedBishop of Porto, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo José da Costa Rebęlo (VIAF: 98901366)
Bishop Jerónimo José da Costa Rebęlo (born , died ) Bishop of Porto

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 313
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016