Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim Pereira Ferraz, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Leiria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1787BornBarcelos
9 Sep 181022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
28 May 184961.6SelectedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
28 Sep 184962.0ConfirmedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
3 Feb 185062.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
27 Oct 185265.0SelectedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
10 Mar 185365.4ConfirmedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
27 Feb 187385.4DiedBishop of Leiria, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Pereira Ferraz
Bishop Joaquim Pereira Ferraz O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Leiria

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 157, and Page 336
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1850, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 Dec 2016