Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Moura Coutinho

Deceased

Bishop of Lamego


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1779BornBasto
18 Sep 180223.6Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 184364.6SelectedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
22 Jan 184464.9ConfirmedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
10 Mar 184465.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lamego, Portugal
3 Oct 186182.6DiedBishop of Lamego, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José de Moura Coutinho
Bishop José de Moura Coutinho (born , died ) Bishop of Lamego

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 229
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016