Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francisco de São Luiz (Manoel Justiniano) Cardinal Saraiva, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1766BornPonte de Lima, Portugal
29 Jan 178216.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
7 Mar 178923.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Dec 182155.8SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal
19 Apr 182256.2ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal
19 Apr 182256.2SucceededBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
19 Apr 182256.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Dura
15 Sep 182256.6Ordained BishopBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
30 Apr 182458.2ResignedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
12 Dec 184276.8SelectedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
3 Apr 184377.1ConfirmedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
19 Jun 184377.3Elevated to Cardinal
7 May 184579.2DiedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Francisco de São Luiz (Manoel Justiniano) Saraiva (VIAF: 95302616)
Francisco de São Luiz (Manoel Justiniano) Cardinal Saraiva O.S.B. (born , died ) Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
  • a cardinal for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,459
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 155, and Page 182
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 242
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1822, Number 26
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jun 1843

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016