Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop António José de Freitas Honorato

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1820Born
23 Dec 184323.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jul 187352.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
25 Jul 187352.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
5 Oct 187352.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
12 Jul 188362.7SelectedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
9 Aug 188362.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
28 Dec 189878.1DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António José de Freitas Honorato
Archbishop António José de Freitas Honorato (born , died ) Archbishop of Braga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoimbra, Diocese of Coimbra
Ordained BishopS. Vincent Fora, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 156, and Page 387
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Mar 2017