Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Bernardo da Souza Ennes

Deceased

Bishop of Portalegre, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1814Born
1 Nov 184530.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Nov 184531.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jun 187459.6AppointedBishop of Macau, China
27 Dec 187460.1Ordained BishopBishop of Macau, China
9 Aug 188368.7AppointedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
24 Jul 188570.7SelectedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
30 Jul 188570.7ConfirmedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
8 Dec 188672.0InstalledBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
8 Sep 188772.8DiedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel Bernardo da Souza Ennes
Bishop Manuel Bernardo da Souza Ennes (born , died ) Bishop of Portalegre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillanova de Togo
Ordained BishopSte Marie Madeleine, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 157, and Page 358
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 463
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Apr 2017