Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop António Aires de Gouveia (Ayres de Gouvea)

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Chalcedon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1828Born
12 Mar 187041.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Mar 187041.5Ordained PriestPriest
6 Nov 188456.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethsaida
23 Nov 188456.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bethsaida
14 Nov 190476.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
17 Dec 191688.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon

MicroData Summary for António Aires de Gouveia (Ayres de Gouvea) (VIAF: 34023577)
Archbishop António Aires de Gouveia (Ayres de Gouvea) (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Chalcedon

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorto, Diocese of Porto, Portugal
Ordained BishopCathedral, Porto, Diocese of Porto, Portugal

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,101
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 148
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Apr 2017