Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Augusto Eduardo Nunes

Deceased

Archbishop of Évora, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1849Born
25 May 187223.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 188435.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Évora, Portugal
13 Nov 188435.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Perge
4 Jan 188535.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Perge
18 Sep 189041.4SucceededArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
11 Jul 192071.2DiedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Augusto Eduardo Nunes (VIAF: 100069655)
Archbishop Augusto Eduardo Nunes (born , died ) Archbishop of Évora

EventPlace
Birth PlacePortalegre
Ordained BishopVisitation, Belem

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 257, and Page 447
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017