Catholic-Hierarchy DC

António Cardinal Mendes Bello

Deceased

Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1842BornGouvea, Portugal
17 Dec 186422.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Funchal, Portugal
10 Jun 186523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Funchal, Portugal
187431.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Pinhel, Portugal
188138.5ResignedApostolic Administrator of Pinhel, Portugal
24 Mar 188441.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
24 Mar 188441.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
27 Apr 188441.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
11 Sep 188442.2SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
13 Nov 188442.4ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
19 Dec 190765.5AppointedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
27 Nov 191169.4Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
25 May 191471.9Elevated to Cardinal
8 Sep 191472.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
5 Aug 192987.1DiedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António Mendes Bello:
Cardinal António Mendes Bello (born , died ) Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 64.2 years
  • a bishop for 45.3 years
  • a cardinal for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Nov 1911
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 388, and Page 451

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013