Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Mendes da Conceição Santos

Deceased

Archbishop of Évora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1876BornOlaia
27 May 189922.4Ordained PriestPriest
9 Dec 191538.9AppointedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
3 May 191639.3Ordained BishopBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
4 Jun 192043.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Évora, Portugal
4 Jun 192043.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippopolis in Thracia
24 Jul 192043.6AppointedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
9 Feb 192144.1InstalledArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
30 Mar 195578.2DiedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel Mendes da Conceição Santos:
Archbishop Manuel Mendes da Conceição Santos (born , died ) Archbishop of Évora

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015