Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Enrique Delgado y Gómez

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Pamplona (-Tudela)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1888BornValverde di Llerena
14 Jul 191224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Badajoz, Spain
10 Jun 194354.9AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
3 Oct 194355.2Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
26 Oct 194658.3AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
11 Aug 195668.1AppointedArchbishop of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain
23 Jul 196880.0RetiredArchbishop of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain
23 Jul 196880.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bitettum
11 Dec 197082.4ResignedTitular Archbishop of Bitettum
1 Mar 197889.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain

MicroData Summary for Enrique Delgado y Gómez:
Archbishop Enrique Delgado y Gómez (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Pamplona (-Tudela)

  • a priest for 65.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013