Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edwin Pinto, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ahmedabad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1901BornKarachi
9 Sep 193231.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
5 May 194948.3AppointedBishop of Ahmedabad, India
16 Oct 194948.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ahmedabad, India
4 Aug 197372.5ResignedBishop of Ahmedabad, India
7 Jun 197877.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Ahmedabad, India

MicroData Summary for Edwin Pinto:
Bishop Edwin Pinto S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ahmedabad

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013