Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Bereciartúa y Balerdi

Deceased

Bishop of San Sebastián


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1895BornVidania
19 Dec 191924.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 194650.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zaragoza, Spain
22 Feb 194650.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Andeda
11 Aug 194651.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Andeda
18 Dec 195560.8AppointedBishop of Sigüenza-Guadalajara, Spain
6 Aug 196368.4AppointedBishop of San Sebastián, Spain
23 Oct 196873.6DiedBishop of San Sebastián, Spain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Bereciartúa y Balerdi:
Bishop Lorenzo Bereciartúa y Balerdi (born , died ) Bishop of San Sebastián

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015