Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lino Rodrigo Ruesca

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1885Born
18 Jul 190923.6Ordained PriestPriest
1 May 192943.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Granada, Spain
1 May 192943.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabbora
29 Sep 192943.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabbora
28 Jan 193549.1AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
19 May 197387.4DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Lino Rodrigo Ruesca
Bishop Lino Rodrigo Ruesca (born , died ) Bishop of Huesca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAgüarón

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 43.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018