Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ahmedabad

Dioecesis Ahmedabadensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 5 May 1949
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Gandhinagar
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 14,791 (5,713 Square Miles)
  • Description: In the state of Gujarat: the districts of Ahmedabad, and Kheda
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, Dr. Tankaria Rd., Mirzapur, Ahmadabad-380001, Gujarat, India
  • Telephone: (079) 2562.4105
  • Fax: 2563.1942

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
5 May 1949ErectedArchdiocese of Bombay Diocese of Ahmedabad (erected)
26 February 1977Territory LostDiocese of Ahmedabad Diocese of Rajkot (Syro-Malabarese) (erected)
11 November 2002Territory LostDiocese of Ahmedabad Archdiocese of Gandhinagar (erected)
11 November 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Ahmedabad (from Bombay)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
195029,7649,654,212.3%3838783514012ap1951
195937,92711,172,070.3%59596428013719ap1960
197046,54114,221,918.3%8768455413324016ap1971
198057,00011,600,000.5%13799261916021724ap1981
199070,04215,440,907.5%3410513950318836439ap1991
199976,00015,563,175.5%7210918141915442049ap2000
200076,00015,600,000.5%7611118740615141649ap2001
200176,00015,600,000.5%7811118940215141649ap2002
200262,0008,292,709.7%518013147313432439ap2003
200364,8159,750,454.7%658014544712234237ap2004
200464,9259,750,454.7%648014445011734338ap2005
200666,0389,902,358.7%687914744911933339ap2007
201270,03810,143,092.7%779016741913137442ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013