Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Ignatius Macwan

Archbishop of Gandhinagar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1952 BornBhavnagar
9 Apr 198835.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ahmedabad, India
11 Nov 200250.0AppointedBishop of Ahmedabad, India
11 Jan 200350.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ahmedabad, India
12 Jun 201562.6AppointedArchbishop of Gandhinagar, India
12 Sep 201562.9InstalledArchbishop of Gandhinagar, India

MicroData Summary for Thomas Ignatius Macwan:
Archbishop Thomas Ignatius Macwan (born ) Archbishop of Gandhinagar

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Gandhinagar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,318
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Jun 2015
  • i: MW, 22 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jul 2015