Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stanislaus Fernandes, S.J.

Archbishop Emeritus of Gandhinagar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1939 BornAhmadabad
23 Mar 196828.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ahmedabad, India
15 Aug 197333.8ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
21 May 199050.6AppointedBishop of Ahmedabad, India
24 Aug 199050.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ahmedabad, India
11 Nov 200263.0AppointedArchbishop of Gandhinagar, India
22 Dec 200263.2InstalledArchbishop of Gandhinagar, India
12 Jun 201575.6RetiredArchbishop of Gandhinagar, India

MicroData Summary for Stanislaus Fernandes:
Archbishop Stanislaus Fernandes S.J. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Gandhinagar

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Gandhinagar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,382
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 13 Jun 2015