Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Athanasius Rethna Swamy Swamiadian

Bishop of Ahmedabad, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1961 Born
29 Mar 198928.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ahmedabad, India
29 Jan 201856.9AppointedBishop of Ahmedabad, India
14 Apr 201857.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ahmedabad, India

MicroData Summary for Athanasius Rethna Swamy Swamiadian
Bishop Athanasius Rethna Swamy Swamiadian (born ) Bishop of Ahmedabad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParampukkarai, Diocese of Kottar
Ordained PriestKandanvilai, Diocese of Kottar
Ordained BishopGrounds of St. Mary's High School, Nadiad

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ahmedabad.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jan 2018
  • ob: CB, 3 Feb 2018
  • c2: CB, 12 Apr 2018
  • c34: CB, 14 Apr 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,759

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 3 Jul 2018

Quantcast