Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felix Anthony Machado

Bishop of Vasai, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1948 Born
30 Oct 197628.3Ordained PriestPriest of Bombay, India
22 May 199849.9IncardinatedPriest of Vasai, India
16 Jan 200859.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Nashik, India
8 Mar 200859.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nashik, India
10 Nov 200961.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Vasai, India

MicroData Summary for Felix Anthony Machado
Archbishop Felix Anthony Machado (born ) Bishop of Vasai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRemedy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Diocese of Vasai.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,686

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018