Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Oswald Cardinal Gracias

Archbishop of Bombay

Cardinal-Priest of San Paolo della Croce a “Corviale”

Member of the Council of Cardinals


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1944 BornMumbai
20 Dec 197026.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bombay, India
28 Jun 199752.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India
28 Jun 199752.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bladia
16 Sep 199752.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bladia
7 Sep 200055.7AppointedArchbishop of Agra, India
14 Oct 200661.8AppointedArchbishop of Bombay, India
14 Dec 200662.0InstalledArchbishop of Bombay, India
24 Nov 200762.9Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 200762.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Paolo della Croce a “Corviale”
10 May 200863.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Paolo della Croce a “Corviale”
13 Apr 201368.3AppointedMember of the Council of Cardinals

MicroData Summary for Oswald Gracias:
Oswald Cardinal Gracias (born ) Archbishop of Bombay

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Bombay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Oct 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,142
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,216
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 6 May 2014