Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Barthol Barretto

Auxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India

Titular Bishop of Strongoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1961 Born
8 Apr 198927.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bombay, India
20 Dec 201655.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India
20 Dec 201655.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Strongoli
28 Jan 201755.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Strongoli

MicroData Summary for Barthol Barretto
Bishop Barthol Barretto (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bombay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMahim

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Bombay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Dec 2016
  • ob: CB, 6 Jan 2017
  • c2+: CB, 28 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jan 2017