Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Delhi

Archidioecesis Delhiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Split: 4 June 1959
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 15,420 (5,955 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.delhiarchdiocese.com/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, 1 Ashok Place, New Delhi-110001, India
  • Telephone: (011)2334.34.57; 2336.20.58
  • Fax: 2374.65.75

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Archdiocese of Simla
13 September 1910ErectedArchdiocese of Agra
Diocese of Lahore
Archdiocese of Simla (erected)
Archdiocese of Delhi and Simla
13 April 1937Name ChangedArchdiocese of Simla Archdiocese of Delhi and Simla
Archdiocese of Delhi
4 June 1959SplitArchdiocese of Delhi and Simla Archdiocese of Delhi
Diocese of Simla

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Delhi and Simla
19509,100835,3991.1%41317535125412ap1951
Archdiocese of Delhi
196922,2507,500,000.3%2824524275215112ap1971
198027,7319,362,000.3%486411224721527919ap1981
199048,56712,208,900.4%529915132126440730ap1991
199881,00018,250,000.4%7611218843029153946ap2002
200299,80018,900,000.5%8211419650928763447ap2003
2003105,00018,920,000.6%9912822746230782851ap2004
2004105,20018,920,900.6%10812823644537881560ap2005
2006106,80019,016,000.6%11212824044530181570ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 4 Jul 2013