Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry D’Souza

Bishop of Bellary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1949 BornKinnigoly
5 May 197626.7Ordained PriestPriest of Mangalore, India
15 Mar 200858.5AppointedBishop of Bellary, India
12 Jun 200858.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bellary, India
16 Oct 201263.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Shimoga, India
7 May 201464.7ResignedApostolic Administrator of Shimoga, India

MicroData Summary for Henry D’Souza:
Bishop Henry D’Souza (born ) Bishop of Bellary

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bellary.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,759

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 6 May 2014