Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Allwyn D’Silva

Auxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India

Titular Bishop of Dura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1948 Born
19 Apr 197526.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bombay, India
20 Dec 201668.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India
20 Dec 201668.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dura
28 Jan 201768.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dura

MicroData Summary for Allwyn D’Silva
Bishop Allwyn D’Silva (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bombay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMumbai

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Bombay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Dec 2016
  • ob: CB, 6 Jan 2017
  • c2+: CB, 28 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jan 2017