Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Telesphore Bilung, S.V.D.

Auxiliary Bishop of Ranchi, India

Titular Bishop of Rutabo

Apostolic Administrator of Jamshedpur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1961 Born
2 May 199231.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
6 May 201453.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ranchi, India
6 May 201453.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Rutabo
30 Aug 201453.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rutabo
20 Jun 201958.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Jamshedpur, India

MicroData Summary for Telesphore Bilung
Bishop Telesphore Bilung S.V.D. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ranchi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSargidipa
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Loyola grounds, Ranchi, Archdiocese of Ranchi

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Ranchi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 May 2014
  • ob/c2+: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,278
  • ab: CB, 20 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast