Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Rodrigues

Auxiliary Bishop of Bombay

Titular Bishop of Deultum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1967 BornMumbai
18 Apr 199830.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bombay, India
15 May 201345.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India
15 May 201345.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Deultum
29 Jun 201345.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Deultum

MicroData Summary for John Rodrigues:
Bishop John Rodrigues (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bombay

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Bombay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 May 2013
  • ob: CB, 15 May 2013
  • c2+: CB, 29 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,808

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013