Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Filipe Neri António Sebastião do Rosário Ferrão

Archbishop of Goa e Damão, India

Patriarch of East Indies


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1953 Born
28 Oct 197926.7Ordained PriestPriest of Goa e Damão, India
20 Dec 199340.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Goa e Damão, India
20 Dec 199340.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Vanariona
10 Apr 199441.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vanariona
12 Dec 200350.8AppointedArchbishop of Goa e Damão, India
12 Dec 200350.8AppointedPatriarch of East Indies, India
21 Mar 200451.1InstalledArchbishop of Goa e Damão, India

MicroData Summary for Filipe Neri António Sebastião do Rosário Ferrão
Archbishop Filipe Neri António Sebastião do Rosário Ferrão (born ) Archbishop of Goa e Damão

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAldona

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Goa e Damão.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,312

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018