Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raul Nicolau Gonsalves

Archbishop Emeritus of Goa e Damão, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1927 Born
21 Dec 195023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Goa e Damão, India
5 Jan 196739.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Goa e Damão, India
5 Jan 196739.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Rapidum
5 Mar 196739.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rapidum
30 Jan 197850.6AppointedArchbishop of Goa e Damão, India
30 Jan 197850.6AppointedPatriarch of East Indies, India
16 Jan 200476.5RetiredArchbishop of Goa e Damão, India
16 Jan 200476.5RetiredPatriarch of East Indies, India

MicroData Summary for Raul Nicolau Gonsalves
Archbishop Raul Nicolau Gonsalves (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Goa e Damão

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBambolim

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Goa e Damão.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018