Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Xavier da Piedade Rebello

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Goa e Damão

Titular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1891BornMargâo
26 Sep 191524.1Ordained PriestPriest of Goa e Damão, India
15 Nov 196372.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Goa e Damão, India
15 Nov 196372.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
21 Dec 196372.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
196674.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Goa e Damão, India
197280.3RetiredApostolic Administrator of Goa e Damão, India
7 Jul 197583.8DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Goa e Damão, India

MicroData Summary for Francisco Xavier da Piedade Rebello:
Bishop Francisco Xavier da Piedade Rebello (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Goa e Damão

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013