Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Machado

Archbishop of Bangalore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1954 Born
8 Dec 197824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Karwar, India
2 Feb 200651.6AppointedBishop of Belgaum, India
30 Mar 200651.8Ordained BishopBishop of Belgaum, India
19 Mar 201863.8AppointedArchbishop of Bangalore, India

MicroData Summary for Peter Machado (VIAF: 311413662)
Archbishop Peter Machado (born ) Archbishop of Bangalore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHonavar
Ordained BishopSt. Paul High School grounds, Belgaum, Diocese of Belgaum

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bangalore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,104
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast