Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Derek Fernandes

Bishop of Belgaum, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1954 Born
5 May 197924.9Ordained PriestPriest of Belgaum, India
24 Feb 200752.7AppointedBishop of Karwar, India
20 Apr 200752.9Ordained BishopBishop of Karwar, India
1 May 201964.9AppointedBishop of Belgaum, India

MicroData Summary for Derek Fernandes
Bishop Derek Fernandes (born ) Bishop of Belgaum

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSirsi
Ordained BishopGrounds of, St. Joseph's High School, Karwar, Diocese of Karwar

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Belgaum.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Feb 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,405
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 1 May 2019

Quantcast