Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Belgaum

Dioecesis Belgaumensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Peter Machado, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 19 September 1953
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bangalore
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 33,747 (13,034 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, B.C. 69, Belgaum-590001, Karnataka State, India
  • Telephone: (0831)2420.587
  • Fax: 2424.226

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
19 September 1953ErectedArchdiocese of Goa e Damão
Diocese of Poona
Diocese of Belgaum (erected)
24 January 1976Territory LostDiocese of Belgaum Diocese of Karwar (erected)
24 June 2005Territory LostDiocese of Belgaum (Bijapur)
Diocese of Bellary (Gulbarga)
Archdiocese of Hyderabad (Bidar)
Diocese of Gulbarga (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
195946,6735,213,256.9%3715528971511132ap1960
197053,4047,595,309.7%5110715833811920640ap1971
198028,0007,342,000.4%2322456223323923ap1981
199028,2968,650,000.3%4639853324921428ap1991
199929,5039,939,363.3%5741983015524542ap2000
200029,5039,939,363.3%5641973045525142ap2001
200129,5039,939,363.3%59421012925825847ap2002
200229,5039,939,363.3%60531132617126750ap2003
200329,50311,939,363.2%63571202456635956ap2004
200429,52511,939,363.2%64561202466536156ap2005
200629,0959,030,000.3%70551252328135756ap2007
201230,51210,736,000.3%76641402179859367ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013