Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Rodrigues

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Belgaum, India

Titular Bishop of Equizetum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1894Born
19 Dec 191925.1Ordained PriestPriest of Poona, India
19 Sep 195358.9AppointedBishop of Belgaum, India
30 Nov 195359.1Ordained BishopBishop of Belgaum, India
15 Mar 196469.4ResignedBishop of Belgaum, India
15 Mar 196469.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Equizetum
12 Oct 196469.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Belgaum, India

MicroData Summary for Michael Rodrigues
Bishop Michael Rodrigues (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Belgaum

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAhmednagar

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018