Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius P. Lobo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Belgaum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1919BornSiolim
21 Dec 194728.7Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 196748.4AppointedBishop of Belgaum, India
2 Jun 196849.1Ordained BishopBishop of Belgaum, India
1 Dec 199475.6RetiredBishop of Belgaum, India
17 Feb 201090.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Belgaum, India

MicroData Summary for Ignatius P. Lobo:
Bishop Ignatius P. Lobo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Belgaum

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: JPG
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013