Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Godfrey de Rozario, S.J.

Bishop of Baroda, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1946 Born
22 Apr 197831.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
29 Aug 199750.9AppointedBishop of Baroda, India
28 Dec 199751.2Ordained BishopBishop of Baroda, India

MicroData Summary for Godfrey de Rozario
Bishop Godfrey de Rozario S.J. (born ) Bishop of Baroda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAhmadabad

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Baroda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,218
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018