Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José do Patrocinio Dias

Deceased

Bishop of Beja


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1884BornCovilhã
21 Dec 190723.4Ordained PriestPriest of Guarda, Portugal
16 Dec 192036.4AppointedBishop of Beja, Portugal
3 Jun 192136.9Ordained BishopBishop of Beja, Portugal
24 Oct 196581.3DiedBishop of Beja, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José do Patrocinio Dias:
Bishop José do Patrocinio Dias (born , died ) Bishop of Beja

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 44.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 39
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013