Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Cardoso Cunha

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vila Real


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1915BornPenso
16 Apr 193822.7Ordained PriestPriest
9 Mar 195640.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Beja, Portugal
9 Mar 195640.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Baris in Pisidia
10 Jun 195640.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Baris in Pisidia
13 May 196650.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vila Real, Portugal
10 Jan 196751.4SucceededBishop of Vila Real, Portugal
19 Jan 199175.5RetiredBishop of Vila Real, Portugal
13 Jun 200488.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Vila Real, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António Cardoso Cunha:
Bishop António Cardoso Cunha (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vila Real

  • a priest for 66.1 years
  • a bishop for 48.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 51
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015