Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ernesto Sena de Oliveira

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Coimbra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1892BornFunchal
23 Dec 191624.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 May 193139.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
27 May 193139.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
25 Jul 193139.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mitylene
15 Jun 194452.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Lamego, Portugal
29 Oct 194856.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Coimbra, Portugal
12 Aug 196775.3RetiredBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
12 Aug 196775.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Octaba
27 Jan 197178.7ResignedTitular Archbishop of Octaba
13 Oct 197280.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Coimbra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Ernesto Sena de Oliveira:
Archbishop Ernesto Sena de Oliveira (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Coimbra

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 20 May 2014