Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Cosme do Amaral

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Leiria-Fátima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1916BornTouro
13 Aug 193922.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lamego, Portugal
8 Jul 196447.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto, Portugal
8 Jul 196447.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tagaria
23 Aug 196447.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tagaria
1 Jul 197255.7AppointedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
2 Feb 199376.3RetiredBishop of Leiria-Fátima, Portugal
7 Oct 200589.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Leiria-Fátima, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Alberto Cosme do Amaral:
Bishop Alberto Cosme do Amaral (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Leiria-Fátima

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 41.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013