Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Horácio Coelho Cristino

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Titular Bishop of Drusiliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1941BornMaceirinha
15 Aug 196524.2Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 198746.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
20 Aug 198746.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Drusiliana
15 Nov 198746.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Drusiliana
8 May 199553.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Horácio Coelho Cristino:
Bishop Horácio Coelho Cristino (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 29.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,908
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013