Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Américo Henriques

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nova Lisboa, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1923Born
19 Jul 194723.7Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 196642.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lamego, Portugal
3 Jul 196642.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tisili
11 Oct 196643.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tisili
15 Apr 196743.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lamego, Portugal
2 Feb 197147.3SucceededBishop of Lamego, Portugal
19 Feb 197248.3AppointedBishop of Nova Lisboa, Angola
13 Apr 197652.5ResignedBishop of Nova Lisboa, Angola
14 Aug 200682.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Nova Lisboa, Angola

MicroData Summary for Américo Henriques
Bishop Américo Henriques (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nova Lisboa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlburitel

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast