Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Zacarias Kamwenho

Archbishop Emeritus of Lubango


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1934 BornChimbundo
9 Jul 196126.8Ordained PriestPriest
26 Aug 197440.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Luanda, Angola
26 Aug 197440.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabla
23 Nov 197440.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabla
10 Aug 197540.9AppointedBishop of Novo Redondo, Angola
3 Mar 199560.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Lubango, Angola
15 Jan 199762.4SucceededArchbishop of Lubango, Angola
5 Sep 200975.0RetiredArchbishop of Lubango, Angola

MicroData Summary for Zacarias Kamwenho:
Archbishop Zacarias Kamwenho (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lubango

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lubango.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013