Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Nunes Gabriel

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Luanda, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1912Born
7 Jul 193522.5Ordained PriestPriest
5 Dec 195744.9AppointedBishop of Malanje, Angola
21 Dec 195745.0Ordained BishopBishop of Malanje, Angola
13 Feb 196249.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Luanda, Angola
13 Feb 196249.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Methymna
17 Nov 196653.9SucceededArchbishop of Luanda, Angola
19 Dec 197562.9ResignedArchbishop of Luanda, Angola
20 Oct 199683.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Luanda, Angola

MicroData Summary for Manuel Nunes Gabriel
Archbishop Manuel Nunes Gabriel (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Luanda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFundada
Ordained BishopCathedral, Luanda, Archdiocese of Luanda

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 38.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 462, Ascendance
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 657

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast