Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Huambo

Archidioecesis Huambensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • José de Queirós Alves, C.SS.R., Archbishop
  • Francisco Viti, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 3 February 1977
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Angola
  • Square Kilometers: 29,500 (11,394 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Arcebispado, C.P. 10, Huambo, Angola
  • Telephone: (2412)20.130
  • Fax: 20.853

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Nova Lisboa
4 September 1940ErectedDiocese of Angola e Congo Diocese of Nova Lisboa (erected)
27 July 1955Territory LostDiocese of Nova Lisboa Diocese of Sá da Bandeira (erected)
6 June 1970Territory LostDiocese of Nova Lisboa Diocese of Benguela (erected)
10 August 1975Territory LostDiocese of Nova Lisboa
Diocese of Sá da Bandeira
Diocese of Serpa Pinto (erected)
10 August 1975Territory LostDiocese of Nova Lisboa
Diocese of Sá da Bandeira
Diocese of Pereira de Eça (erected)
Archdiocese of Huambo
3 February 1977ElevatedDiocese of Nova Lisboa Archdiocese of Huambo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Nova Lisboa
1950394,6211,284,66830.7%131021153,4311149837ap1951
1966754,7651,327,91356.8%69971664,54614518559ap1967
1970880,0001,670,00052.7%86791655,33313620429ap1971
Archdiocese of Huambo
1980767,0001,330,00057.7%27224915,653605634ap1981
19901,088,0041,750,00062.2%30235320,52810213455ap1991
19991,000,0002,890,00034.6%27224920,40820916542ap2000
20001,290,0002,336,21155.2%32215324,33917415620ap2001
20011,170,0002,072,58656.5%39236218,87013215220ap2002
20021,119,5902,012,18055.6%41266716,71011415820ap2003
20031,056,0001,956,00054.0%43226516,24613017020ap2004
20041,120,0001,956,00057.3%51207115,77411917342ap2005
20061,278,0002,083,00061.4%57207716,5978515042ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011