Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Zeferino Zeca Martins, S.V.D.

Archbishop of Huambo, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1966 Born
1 Oct 199428.5Perpetual VowsMember of Society of the Divine Word
6 Aug 199529.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
19 May 201246.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Luanda, Angola
19 May 201246.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanaramusa
12 Aug 201246.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanaramusa
1 Oct 201852.5AppointedArchbishop of Huambo, Angola

MicroData Summary for Zeferino Zeca Martins
Archbishop Zeferino Zeca Martins S.V.D. (born ) Archbishop of Huambo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCacolo
Ordained BishopPavilhão da Cidadela Desportiva, Luanda, Archdiocese of Luanda

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Huambo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 May 2012
  • ob: CB, 21 Jun 2012
  • c2: CB, 12 Aug 2012
  • c34: CB, 13 Aug 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,525
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 1 Oct 2018

Quantcast