Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Francisco Jaca, S.V.D.

Bishop of Benguela, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1963 Born
29 Sep 199026.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
6 Jun 200743.5AppointedBishop of Caxito, Angola
22 Jul 200743.7Ordained BishopBishop of Caxito, Angola
14 Oct 200743.9InstalledBishop of Caxito, Angola
26 Mar 201854.3AppointedBishop of Benguela, Angola
9 Jun 201854.5InstalledBishop of Benguela, Angola

MicroData Summary for António Francisco Jaca
Bishop António Francisco Jaca S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Benguela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuessua
Ordained BishopGrand Seminary, Luanda, Archdiocese of Luanda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Benguela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jun 2007
  • ob/i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,482
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Mar 2018
  • i: CB, 7 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 8 Jun 2018

Quantcast